Dempsey, James Brendan (CPSO#: 25947)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Record Storage and Retrieval Services 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: 416-398-0638 Toll free: 1-800-563-3732 Fax: 416-398-5932
Date Received: 20 Jun 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013