Dempster, Jeffrey James (CPSO#: 62412)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jul 2010