Deneault, Paul Douglas (CPSO#: 52969)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Oct 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Oct 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Ottawa, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 16 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Oct 1997