Deneka, Shirley Isabel (CPSO#: 17443)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 13 Dec 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Dec 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 01 Jan 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 1960
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Apr 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1965
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 13 Dec 1996