Deng, Zhihui (CPSO#: 98889)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jun 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 02 Jun 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Shandong University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamiton Health Sciences
Regional Rehabilitation Centre
300 Wellington Street North
Hamilton ON  L8L 0A4
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 02 Jun 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 19 Sep 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

McMaster University, 20 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 02 Jun 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Zhihui Deng may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division   of   Physical   Medicine  and  Rehabilitation,  McMaster
                        University, in which Dr. Deng  holds an academic appointment at the
                        rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires  seven  years from
                  the  date  of  issuance  or  when  Dr.  Deng no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that  Dr.  Deng's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional  conduct,  or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not  receive  an  annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Deng's certificate of
                        registration, following consideration of  the  practice  assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on June 2, 2017, and expires on June 30, 2020.
                  Upon  renewal  of Dr. Deng's academic appointment at McMaster University,
                  the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs
                  2 and 3 above.