Denis-LeBlanc, Manon Amelie (CPSO#: 71175)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: Denis, Manon Amelie (used until: 25 Oct 2006 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4553 St Catherine Street
St Isidore ON  K0C 2B0
Phone: (613) 524-3225
Fax: (613) 524-2513
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hopital Montfort
713 Chemin Montreal
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Canada
Phone: (613) 746-4621
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Denis-LeBlanc Medecine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Denis-LeBlanc ( CPSO# 71175 )

Business Address:
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4691

Business Address:
4553 St Catherine Street
St Isidore ON  K0C 2B0
Phone Number: (613) 524-3225

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANON AMELIE DENIS-LEBLANC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DENIS-LEBLANC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1999