Dennery, Jean Maurice (CPSO#: 19323)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Creole, English, French, Italian, Spanish

Education:University of Haiti, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 27 Nov 1963 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1960
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1961
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jun 2009