Dennison, Heather Doreen (CPSO#: 62729)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Oct 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
900 Merivale Road
Ottawa ON  K1Z 5Z8
Phone: (613) 722-2161
Fax: (613) 722-8471
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Graves / Heather Dennison Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Graves ( CPSO# 63570 )
Dr. H. Dennison ( CPSO# 62729 )

Business Address:
Carlington Community and Health Services
900 Merivale Road
Ottawa ON  K1Z 5Z8
Phone Number: (613) 722-3849

Business Address:
Emergency Department
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-4710

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER DOREEN DENNISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DENNISON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 1991