Dennison, Jeffrey Andrew (CPSO#: 66660)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2462 Howard Avenue
Suite 200
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone: (519) 258-1156
Fax: (519) 258-9774
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey A. Dennison Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dennison ( CPSO# 66660 )

Business Address:
Suite 200
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 258-1156

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY ANDREW DENNISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DENNISON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1995