Dent, Kenneth Victor (CPSO#: 28812)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 May 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1977 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1991