Dent, Peter Boris (CPSO#: 21313)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 May 1968

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 May 1968

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
Room 3A5
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75382
Fax: (905) 521-4968
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 15 Nov 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER BORIS DENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DENT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1960
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jul 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 1968