Dent, Susan Faye (CPSO#: 62571)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: 613-737-7700 Ext. 70170
Fax: 613-247-3511
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Susan Dent Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dent ( CPSO# 62571 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Regional Cancer Centre
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-7700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 07 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN FAYE DENT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DENT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1992