Denton, Omotayo (CPSO#: 74207)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 2000

Summary

Former Name: Denton, Patricia Helen Omotayo (used until: 27 Jul 2000 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ibadan, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Radiology
Humber River Regional Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Denton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 28 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Denton ( CPSO# 74207 )

Business Address:
Humber River Regional Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OMOTAYO DENTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DENTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 02 Aug 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2000