Denton, Richard Gordon (CPSO#: 29396)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 2 Water Lane Kirkland Lake, ON P2N 3M6
Date Received: 04 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018