Denys, Allen Phillip (CPSO#: 29235)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 03 Apr 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100-55 Edinborough St.
Windsor ON  N8X 3C3
Phone: (519) 258-0585 Ext. 311
Fax: (519) 258-6304
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2055 Huron Church
Windsor ON  N9C 2L6
Canada
Phone: (519) 258-1033
Fax: (519) 915-7528
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Denys Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 20 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Denys ( CPSO# 29235 )

Business Address:
1695 Manning Road
Unit 120
Tecumseh ON  N8N 2L9
Phone Number: (519) 739-2727

Business Address:
100-55 Edinborough Street
Windsor ON  N8X 3C3
Phone Number: (519) 258-0585

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida
USA - Indiana
USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Respirology Effective: 25 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Apr 2018
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 17 Apr 2018

Pending Hearings

Summary: Dr. Allen Phillip Denys (February 2, 2018) Allegations of Dr. Denys’ professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Denys is incompetent and/or has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care of patients. It is also alleged that Dr. Denys engaged acts or omissions relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, including by ordering investigations and/or treatments for patients without appropriate clinical indication in respect of which he and/or members of his family obtained a benefit, and by failing to comply with conflict of interest requirements.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 17 Apr 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from April 17, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Allen Phillip Denys
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Denys to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  According to the undertaking dated April 3, 2018, Dr. Denys was required
                  to obtain a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College by April 17,
                  2018.   A supervisor has not been obtained therefore; Dr. Denys must
                  cease practising sleep medicine until such time as he has obtained a
                  Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.
                  
                  
            As from April 3, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Allen Phillip Denys,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Denys to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. ALLEN PHILLIP DENYS
                                          ("Dr. Denys")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Narcotics Monitoring System implemented under the
                  Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public. 
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Denys, certificate of registration number 29235, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Denys, acknowledge that the College has referred to the Discipline
                  Committee, in the matter of College File Number 7215697, allegations of
                  professional misconduct and incompetence in my sleep medicine practice.  

            (4)   I, Dr. Denys, have read the Notice of Hearing dated February 2, 2018,
                  which sets out the allegations against me.  I am aware of the College's
                  concern about protecting the public and I understand the nature of the
                  allegations against me.

            (5)   I, Dr. Denys, acknowledge that the College has accepted this Undertaking
                  in lieu of making an Order under section 25.4 of the Code at this time.

            (6)   I, Dr. Denys, acknowledge that this Undertaking does not preclude the ICR
                  Committee from making an order at a later date in accordance with the
                  Code.

            (7)   I, Dr. Denys, acknowledge that this Undertaking continues in force until
                  the matters currently referred are disposed of by a panel of the
                  Discipline Committee.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (8)   I, Dr. Denys, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (9)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Denys, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Denys, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Within fourteen (14) days of signing his or her undertaking
                              at Appendix "A", conduct an initial visit to each Practice
                              Location where I practice sleep medicine to:
                  
                              1.    Review and provide feedback on patient management and
                                    systems issues, including but not limited to patient
                                    triage, the management and follow-up of patients
                                    diagnosed with obstructive sleep apnea and the
                                    identification of patients whose condition or
                                    sleepiness score requires reporting to the Ministry of
                                    Transportation; and
                  
                              2.    Directly observe sleep medicine consultations conducted
                                    by me and the physician assistants at that Practice
                                    Location.
                  
                        (ii)  Thereafter, meet with me at my Practice Location, or another
                              location approved by the College, once every two weeks;
                  
                        (iii) Review at least twenty (20) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting, which shall be selected by the Clinical
                              Supervisor(s) independent of my participation, on the basis
                              of the areas of concern identified in the medical inspector's
                              reports dated August 29, 2017, November 24, 2017 and January
                              7, 2018, and any concerns that arise during the period of
                              Clinical Supervision;
                  
                        (iv)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (v)   Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (vi)  Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              month, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s) has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Denys, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the areas of
                        concern identified in the reports of the medical inspector dated
                        August 29, 2017, November 24, 2017 and January 7, 2018, and
                        concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Denys, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Denys, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within fourteen
                        (14) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Denys, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        fourteen (14) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Denys, acknowledge that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (9)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising sleep medicine until such time
                        as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Denys, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practicing
                        sleep medicine as a result of section (9)(g) above this will
                        constitute a term, condition or limitation on my Certificate of
                        Registration and that term, condition or limitation will be
                        included on the public register.
                  
            (10)  I, Dr. Denys, undertake to inform the College of each and every location
                  that I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to,
                  hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively
                  my "Practice Location(s)"), within five (5) days of executing this
                  Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of
                  any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing
                  practice at that location.

            (11)  I, Dr. Denys, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with,
                  unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and and to any other
                  activity the College deems necessary in order to monitor my compliance
                  with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (12)  I, Dr. Denys, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (13)  I, Dr. Denys, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (14)  I, Dr. Denys, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (15)  I, Dr. Denys, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (16)  I, Dr. Denys, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities,
                  at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (17)  I, Dr. Denys, acknowledge that, in the event of an appeal of any Order of
                  the Discipline Committee, if the Discipline Committee has directed the
                  Registrar to revoke, suspend, or impose terms and conditions on my
                  certificate of registration, that Order will take effect immediately
                  despite any appeal.

            (18)  I, Dr. Denys, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (19)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Denys, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Denys, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (19)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                        Dr. Denys is the subject of a referral to the Discipline Committee
                        into allegations of professional misconduct and incompetence in his
                        sleep medicine practice. As a result of the referral:
                  
                              *     Dr. Denys must practise under the guidance of a
                                    Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College. 
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (20)  I, Dr. Denys, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
                  may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (21)  I, Dr. Denys, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form
                  attached hereto as Appendix "B". 

            (22)  I, Dr. Denys, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to all Clinical Supervisors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (23)  I, Dr. Denys, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (24)  I, Dr. Denys, give my irrevocable consent to all Clinical Supervisors and
                  Chiefs of Staff to disclose to the College, and to one another, any
                  information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A"; and/or
                  
                  (c)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: April 3, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Allen Phillip Denys to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 3, 2018:

Dr. Denys is the subject of a referral to the Discipline Committee into allegations of professional misconduct and incompetence in his sleep medicine practice. As a result of the referral:

Dr. Denys must practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.