Deobald, Raymond Gilbert (CPSO#: 92688)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
General Surgical Oncology Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 May 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Surgical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Surgical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 May 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jul 2014