Deodhare, Sanjeev Shantaram (CPSO#: 56373)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Oct 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Marathi

Education:University of Bombay, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospita
3001 HOSPITAL GATE
OAKVILLE
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: 9058452571 Ext. 3687
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

CREDIT VALLEY HOSPITAL
2200 EGLINTON AVE WEST
MISSISSAUGA
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Canada
Phone: (805) 813-1100 Ext. 6439
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

1262 Don Mills Road
North York ON  M3B 2W7
Canada
Phone: 4164492166
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Gamma Dynacare Medical Lab
115 Midair Court
Brampton ON  L6T 5M3
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sanjeev Deodhare Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Deodhare ( CPSO# 56373 )

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8

Business Address:
115 Midair Court
Brampton ON  L6T 5M3

Business Address:
1262 Don Mills Road
North York ON  M3B 2W7

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Ohio
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANJEEV SHANTARAM DEODHARE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEODHARE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1990