Deol, Navtej Singh (CPSO#: 62123)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAVTEJ SINGH DEOL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEOL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1991