Depass, Ian Egbert (CPSO#: 64925)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 May 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 07 Aug 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
65 Thames Street
Chatham ON  N7L 1S4
Phone: (519) 354-1241
Fax: (519) 354-1208
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DePass Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Depass ( CPSO# 64925 )

Business Address:
65 Thames Street
Chatham ON  N7L 1S4
Phone Number: (519) 354-1200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 17 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 May 1992
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 30 Mar 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 30 Mar 2010 Active View Details [+]

            As from 11:59 p.m., March 30, 2010, by order of the Discipline Committee of the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions
            and limitations are imposed on the certificate registration held by Dr. Ian
            Egbert Depass:

                  a)    Dr. Depass' practice shall be limited to being a surgical assistant
                        in a hospital setting, and he may only practise as a surgical
                        assistant while a certified surgeon who has been approved by the
                        College is performing the surgery and is in attendance.  This means
                        that he may only assist other surgeons on their cases and cannot by
                        the primary surgeon in any case, and that he is precluded from
                        providing pre-operative and post-operative care or any office
                        practice.
                  
                  b)    That notice be placed in the operating room area so that all
                        professional staff are aware of the restrictions noted in (a).

                  c)    That so long as the above terms, conditions and limitations are in
                        effect, Dr. Depass shall co-operate with unannounced inspections of
                        his practice and patient charts by a College representative for the
                        purpose of monitoring and enforcing his compliance with them.  

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 10 Jul 2012
Summary:

 On July 10, 2012, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Ian Egbert DePass committed an act of 
 professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. 
 Dr. DePass admitted to the professional misconduct. Since early August 2008, Dr. DePass has been 
 practising only as a surgical assistant.

The Discipline Committee found that Dr. DePass failed to 
 maintain the standard of practice of the profession in relation to his care and treatment of five 
 patients.
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1.	the Registrar maintain the 
 following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. DePass' certificate of registration:

(i)	Dr. 
 DePass' practice shall be limited to being a surgical assistant in a hospital setting, and he may 
 only practise as a surgical assistant while a certified surgeon who has been approved by the 
 College is performing the surgery and is in attendance. This means that he may only assist other 
 surgeons on their cases and cannot be the primary surgeon in any case, and that he is precluded 
 from providing preoperative and postoperative care or any office practice.

(ii)	That notice be 
 placed in the operating room area so that all professional staff are aware of the restrictions 
 noted in (i). 

(iii)	That so long as the above terms, conditions and limitations are in effect, 
 Dr. DePass shall cooperate with unannounced inspections of his practice and patient charts by a 
 College representative for the purpose of monitoring and enforcing his compliance with 
 them.

2.	Dr. DePass appear before the panel to be reprimanded.

3.	Dr. DePass pay costs to the 
 College in the amount of $3,650 within ninety (90) days from the date of this Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): July 10, 2012


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Oct 2009
Summary:

On October 8, 2009, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Depass, a general surgeon, 
committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of 
practice of the profession. The Committee also found that Dr. Depass is incompetent, that is, his 
care of three patients displayed a lack of knowledge, skill and judgment and disregard for patient 
welfare of such a nature and to an extent that demonstrates that he is unfit to continue to practise 
or that his practice should be restricted. 
 
The Committee found that Dr. Depass failed to meet the standard of practice and is incompetent 
with respect to his management of the abdominal surgery of three patients including aspects of 
pre-operative, intra-operative and post-operative care such as: 
 
            Regarding Patient A, failing to take sufficient steps to confirm the working 
            diagnosis in advance of the operation and in the post-operative management of the 
            patient. 
 
            Regarding Patient B, in failing to conduct a radiologic procedure during surgery 
            and failing to undertake sufficient investigations during the post-operative period 
            before discharging the patient. 
 
            Regarding Patient E, in failing to refer the patient to a surgeon with the requisite 
            skill to manage a difficult and locally-advanced tumor. 
 
On March 30, 2010, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
1.    Dr. DePass attend before the panel to be reprimanded on a date not later than three 
      months from the date that the order becomes final. 
 
2.    The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. DePass' 
      certificate of registration for an indefinite period of time: 
 
      a)    Dr. DePass' practice shall be limited to being a surgical assistant in a hospital 
            setting, and he may only practise as a surgical assistant while a certified surgeon 
            who has been approved by the College is performing the surgery and is in 
            attendance. This means that he may only assist other surgeons on their cases and 
            cannot be the primary surgeon in any case, and that he is precluded from 
            providing pre-operative and post-operative care or any office practice. 
 
      b)    That notice be placed in the operating room area so that all professional staff are 
            aware of the restrictions noted in (a). 
 
      c)    That so long as the above terms, conditions and limitations are in effect, Dr. 
            DePass shall co-operate with unannounced inspections of his practice and patient 
            charts by a College representative for the purpose of monitoring and enforcing his 
            compliance with them. 
 
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              
              

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): June 22-24 and June 26 continuing July 7-9, 2009