Depew, William Thomas (CPSO#: 26976)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William T. Depew Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 17 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital, 166 Brock Street, Kingston, ON K7L 5G2
Date Received: 16 Jun 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jun 2015