Deppisch, Linda Marie (CPSO#: 60661)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Streetsville Medical Centre
5425 Creditview Road
Unit 8
Mississauga ON  L5V 2P3
Phone: (905) 826-1164
Fax: (905) 826-1214
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Linda Deppisch Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Deppisch ( CPSO# 60661 )

Business Address:
8 - 5425 Creditview Road
Mississauga ON  L5V 2P3
Phone Number: (905) 826-1164

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDA MARIE DEPPISCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEPPISCH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1990