Derby, Angus Campbell (CPSO#: 12107)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1941

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1951 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 1946
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2000