Derby, Ian Ralph Gaukrodger (CPSO#: 26642)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1974

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 24 Feb 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1977 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 01 Jan 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 24 Feb 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 24 Feb 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from February 24, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Ian Ralph Gaukrodger
            Derby, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Derby to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Derby has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all
                  jurisdictions.