Derbyshire, George Edward (CPSO#: 29793)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Nov 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Nov 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mountdale Family Health Clinic
620 Arthur Street West
Thunder Bay ON  P7E 5R8
Phone: (807) 577-5676
Fax: (807) 577-7911
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Derbyshire Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 03 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Derbyshire ( CPSO# 29793 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
1265 Arthur Street East
Thunder Bay ON  P7E 6E7
Phone Number: (807) 622-0606

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 11 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE EDWARD DERBYSHIRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DERBYSHIRE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Aug 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 1988