Derdemezi, Jeanette (CPSO#: 55049)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: Derdemezi-Boyd, Janet Joanna (used until: 18 Jun 1986 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Athens, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 2862 Palos Verdes Drive North Rolling Hills CA 90274 United States
Date Received: 13 Jun 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 15 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 31 Dec 1989
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Dec 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jun 2016