Derenda, Yolanda (CPSO#: 31109)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 11 Feb 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Feb 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Fulgosi, Yolanda (used until: 28 Mar 1982 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English, Italian

Education:University of Zagreb, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1978 to 01 Sep 1978
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1979
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2001
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 09 Jun 2006
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 11 Feb 2008

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 27 Nov 2007
Summary:

 On November 27, 2007, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Derenda committed an act of 
 professional misconduct under paragraph 1(1)33 of O. Reg. 856/93 in that she has engaged in an act 
 or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, 
 would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, and under 
 paragraph 1(1)1 of O. Reg. 856/93 in that she has contravened a term, condition or limitation on 
 her certificate of registration.

The Discipline Committee reserved its decision on penalty.  On 
 February 11, 2008, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1.  	The Registrar revoked 
 Dr. Derenda's certificate of registration, effective immediately.

2. 	Dr. Derenda pay costs to 
 the College in the amount of $12,215.24 within 90 days of the date of this Order.

3.  	The 
 results of this proceeding be included on the register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Nov 27, 2007


Committee: Fitness To Practise
Decision Date: 08 Mar 2001
Summary:

 On March 8, 2001, the Fitness to Practise Committee found Dr. Derenda to be incapacitated and 
 ordered the following:


1. That the Registrar to impose the following terms, conditions and 
 limitations on Dr. Derenda(s certificate of registration: 
(a)	Dr. Derenda may not practice unless 
 and until:
(i)	Dr. Derenda is monitored by a member holding a certificate of practice in Ontario 
 who is acceptable to the Registrar, which member has executed and is in compliance with an 
 acknowledgement and undertaking in a form agreeable to the Registrar and has delivered such 
 acknowledgement and undertaking to the College within thirty (30) days of the date it is agreed 
 upon by the Registrar.  Should any person who has executed an acknowledgement and undertaking for 
 Dr. Derenda pursuant to this order be unable or unwilling to continue under the terms of the 
 acknowledgement and undertaking, Dr. Derenda will provide, within thirty (30) days, a fresh 
 acknowledgement and undertaking from a further person who is satisfactory to the Registrar in a 
 form satisfactory to the Registrar;

(ii)	Dr. Derenda obtain a satisfactory result on a peer 
 assessment on a bi-annual basis; and

(iii)	Dr. Derenda participate in ongoing psychiatric 
 treatment by a psychiatrist certified by the Royal College as frequently as recommended by the 
 psychiatrist and until such time as the psychiatrist advises the Registrar that such treatment is 
 no longer required.

2.	That the Registrar to immediately suspend Dr. Derenda(s certificate of 
 registration in the event that Dr. Derenda fails to comply with any provision of this order, until 
 such time as Dr. Derenda is in compliance with this order.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 08 Mar 2001