Dermer, Mark (CPSO#: 62610)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 500
267 O'Connor Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 1V3
Phone: (613) 232-4817
Fax: (613) 232-4818
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Dermer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 15 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dermer ( CPSO# 62610 )

Business Address:
Suite 500
267 O'Connor Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 1V3
Phone Number: (613) 232-4817

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK DERMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DERMER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1991