Deroche, Peter Lavinis (CPSO#: 53378)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Sep 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 4595
Fax: (416) 586-5970
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 08 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER LAVINIS DEROCHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEROCHE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1986