Dervaitis, Kristina Lucy (CPSO#: 74969)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 309
712 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8C3
Phone: (905) 953-1900
Fax: (905) 953-0840
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISTINA LUCY DERVAITIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DERVAITIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005