Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Dervish, Greta Ayshe (CPSO#: 63768)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 403
595 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Phone: (613) 745-8633
Fax: (613) 745-8715
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0L2
Canada
Phone: 6137464621 Ext. 2400
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GRETA AYSHE DERVISH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DERVISH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 6 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1992