Derzko-Dzulynsky, Larissa Anne (CPSO#: 66521)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish, Ukrainian

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 501
340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone: (416) 928-1335
Fax: (416) 928-5075
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kensington Eye Institute
340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Canada
Phone: (416) 928-2132
Fax: (416) 928-6607
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
Phone: (416) 530-6118
Fax: (416) 530-6291
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

St. Michael's Hospital
61 Queen Street East Suite 801
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Canada
Phone: (416) 867-7422
Fax: (416) 867-3488
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Derzko-Dzulynsky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Derzko-Dzulynsky ( CPSO# 66521 )

Business Address:
Suite 501
340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 928-1335

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6118

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital, Eye Clinic
61 Queen Street East
6th Floor
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 867-7422

Business Address:
Kensington Eye Institute
340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 928-2132

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LARISSA ANNE DERZKO-DZULYNSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DERZKO-DZULYNSKY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998