Desai, Heeten (CPSO#: 57376)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Oct 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Oct 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
350 N. Wilmot St
Tucson AZ  85711
United States
Phone: (520) 873-3000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Arizona

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 13 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEETEN DESAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DESAI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2001