Desai, Hiren Bhupendra (CPSO#: 61743)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Oct 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Apr 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Marathi

Education:University of Bombay, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1720 Howard Avenue
Suite 259
Windsor ON  N8X 5A6
Phone: (519) 254-4424
Fax: (519) 254-4194
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hiren Desai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Desai ( CPSO# 61743 )

Business Address:
259 - 1720 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 5A6
Phone Number: (519) 254-4424

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 29 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HIREN BHUPENDRA DESAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DESAI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 1991