Desai, Manish (CPSO#: 69707)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 14 Dec 1995 to 09 Jan 1996
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Jan 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Aug 2008