Desai, Mukesh Batubhai (CPSO#: 53459)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Bombay, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 13 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jun 2014