Desai, Nimesh (CPSO#: 77541)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 7 Building A
260 Holiday Inn Drive
Cambridge ON  N3C 4E8
Phone: (519) 658-6800
Fax: (519) 658-6801
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nimesh Desai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Desai ( CPSO# 77541 )

Business Address:
Unit 7, Building A
260 Holiday Inn Drive
Cambridge ON  N3C 4E8
Phone Number: (516) 658-6800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NIMESH DESAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DESAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2007