Desai, Rashmikant Jashbhai (CPSO#: 27892)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 31 Mar 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Mar 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:University of Birmingham, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. J. Desai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 21 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: 2433 Presquile Drive Oakville ON L6H 0B8
Date Received: 31 Mar 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 13 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Mar 2015