Desaulniers, Nancy (CPSO#: 84788)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
P O Box 900
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7700
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NANCY DESAULNIERS shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. DESAULNIERS is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. DESAULNIERS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. DESAULNIERS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. DESAULNIERS shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. DESAULNIERS is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. DESAULNIERS no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018