Desharnais, Luc (CPSO#: 57625)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jul 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 07 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jul 2000