Deshauer, Dorian Alvin (CPSO#: 64627)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Sep 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Sep 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Inner City Health Associates
59 Adelaide St. East, 2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M5C 1K6
Phone: (416) 591-4411
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DORIAN ALVIN DESHAUER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DESHAUER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 1991