Deshpande, Amol Arun (CPSO#: 65236)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Comprehensive Pain Program
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
550 University Avenue, 1st Floor
Toronto ON  M6J 3S3
Phone: (416) 597-3422
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.A. Deshpande Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 15 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Deshpande ( CPSO# 65236 )

Business Address:
University Health Network
Unit 2 - 019
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMOL ARUN DESHPANDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DESHPANDE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993