Deshpande, Ashish Sharad (CPSO#: 85372)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Marathi

Education:University of Bombay, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
700 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8X 4T2
Phone: (519) 252-7008
Fax: (519) 252-7002
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1995 LENS AVE.
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Canada
Phone: (519) 254-5577
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ashish Deshpande Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 11 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Deshpande ( CPSO# 85372 )

Business Address:
Suite 200
700 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8X 4T2
Phone Number: (519) 252-7008

Business Address:
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-1661

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASHISH SHARAD DESHPANDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DESHPANDE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 05 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 06 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008