Deshpande, Kumudini Arun (CPSO#: 27080)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Kannada, Marathi

Education:University of Bombay, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 19 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2006