Deshpande, Maneesh Anant (CPSO#: 82648)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Oct 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Oct 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Joseph Brant Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Phone: (905) 632-3730 Ext. 4135
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Deshpande Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 27 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Deshpande ( CPSO# 82648 )

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Phone Number: (905) 632-3730

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANEESH ANANT DESHPANDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DESHPANDE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2010