Deshpande, Rajas Kalidas (CPSO#: 79270)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 May 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 May 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Marathwada University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jun 2003 to 07 Aug 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 08 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 20 Aug 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Aug 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 May 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2006