Deshpande, Rushi Vijaykumar (CPSO#: 78801)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 20 Jan 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Jan 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Government Medical College, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 17 Dec 2003
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 18 Dec 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 20 Jan 2006
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Jan 2006