Desilets, Stacy Ann (CPSO#: 83007)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: Woods, Stacy Ann (used until: 11 Jul 2007 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Great Northern Family Health Team
240 Shepherdson Road
New Liskeard
New Liskeard ON  P0J 1P0
Phone: (705) 6476100
Fax: (705) 6470173
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stacy Desilets Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Desilets ( CPSO# 83007 )

Business Address:
P O Box 1355
240 Shepherdson Road
New Liskeard ON  P0J 1P0
Phone Number: (705) 647-6100

Business Address:
421 Shepherdson Avenue
New Liskeard ON  P0J 1P0
Phone Number: (705) 647-8121

Business Address:
20 May Street
New Liskeard ON  P0J 1P0
Phone Number: (705) 647-4444

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STACY ANN DESILETS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DESILETS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008