Desilva, Sahan Chaminda (CPSO#: 65114)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 19 Feb 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Sinhalese

Education:University of Ottawa, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1993
Suspension of registration imposed: Fitness to Practise Committee Effective: 13 Feb 2000
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 19 Feb 2010
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 19 Feb 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 19 Feb 2010 Active View Details [+]
            As from April 20, 2009, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Sahan Chaminda
            Desilva, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Desilva to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

            (a)   Dr. Sahan Chaminda Desilva has voluntarily entered into an Undertaking
            with the 
                  following provisions:

                  (i)   Dr. Sahan Chaminda Desilva shall limit his practice of medicine to
            non-clinical 
                        settings.  Non-clinical is defined as positions that do not have
            any direct contact 
                        with or involvement in the assessment, treatment or diagnosis of
            patients.

                  (ii)  Dr. Sahan Chaminda Desilva shall not apply to the General Manager
            of the 
                        Ontario Health Insurance Plan ("OHIP") for a billing number.