Desjardins, Marie Pier (CPSO#: 97489)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: CHU Sainte-Justine University Hospital Centre 3175 Chemin de la Côte-Sainte-Catherine Montreal, QC H3T 1C5
Date Received: 29 Apr 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014