Deslauriers, Joseph Albert Jean (CPSO#: 21448)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Aug 2013